WebApr 5, 2024 · Vice Chair, Board of Trustees Samuel M. Mencoff Vice Chair, Board of Trustees. Sylvia M. Neil Vice Chair, Board of Trustees. David J. Vitale Vice Chair, Board of Trustees Frederick H. Waddell … WebAug 1, 2024 · ART AND ARCHITECTURAL REVIEW BOARD . Lynden Garland of Midlothian, Architect, Baskervill . ... BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE SOUTHWEST VIRGINIA HIGHER EDUCATION CENTER . ... Executive Director, Virginia Institute for Spaceflight and Autonomy at Old Dominion University . Nicholas Devereux of Alexandria, …
December 4, 2004 - March 31, 2009 The Clark Archives
WebThe board of trustees is the governing body of The J. Paul Getty Trust. The trustees, as a board or through board committees, set policies relating to spending, management, governance, professional standards, investment, and grant making. ... She has received fellowships and scholarships from the Sterling and Francine Clark Art Institute ... WebDivine Mercy University 45154 Underwood Lane Sterling, VA 20166 (703) 416-1441 google free games to play online
September 8, 1980 - May 8, 1981 The Clark Archives
WebClark Art Institute Board of Trustees Meeting Records, 1950-2009, CAI ARC 2007.46. Sterling and Francine Clark Art Institute Archives. Copy to clipboard. Cite Item Description. September 28, 1968 - March 19, 1970, Container: Volume 11. Clark Art Institute Board of Trustees Meeting Records, 1950-2009, CAI ARC 2007.46. WebMar 19, 2015 · Michael Conforti, the Felda and Dena Hardymon Director of the Clark Art Institute, has informed the Clark’s Board of Trustees that he will retire on August 31, 2015 after more than twenty years in the … WebCalifornia state law vests the authority of the management of the California Institute of the Arts in the Institute’s Board of Trustees. Working with the Institute’s President and its … google free icon library